Financial history THE ECA/CHARLES BROMLEY PRIZE FUND

Charity number: 509847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £846 £1.02k £1.25k £1.37k £1.39k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £33.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A