Accounts and annual returns HURTING TO HEALING

Charity Number: 1172465
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 January 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 25 January 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 24 July 2020 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2019 13 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 13 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2018 27 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 27 November 2018 On Time