Financial history THE KAMBIA APPEAL

Charity number: 1172123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.69k £9.33k £10.60k £12.85k £10.28k
Total expenditure £28.78k £28.68k £11.64k £12.08k £17.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A