Financial history WIRKSWORTH TRANSITION COMMUNITY LAND TRUST

Charity number: 1178158
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.96k £1.63k £2.01k £918 £160
Total expenditure £431 £234 £1.04k £1.92k £685
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 N/A