WIRKSWORTH TRANSITION COMMUNITY LAND TRUST

Charity number: 1178158
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. The relief of poverty or financial hardship, by providing zero carbon housing for people who live in the parishes of Wirksworth and Middleton by Wirksworth. 2. To advance education and the protection of the environment, in particular but not exclusively by providing training, exhibitions, presentations and publications on the environmental and financial benefits of reduced fossil fuel use.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £160
Total expenditure: £685

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 April 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NOEL ROBERT MAYES Chair 17 April 2018
None on record
Alison Louise Clamp Trustee 17 October 2023
None on record
PAMELA ELIZABETH TAYLOR Trustee 17 October 2023
WIRKSWORTH MEMORIAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WIRKSWORTH ARTS FESTIVAL
Received: On time
Roger Paul Shelley Trustee 17 October 2023
None on record
MARY ANN HOOPER Trustee 17 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.96k £1.63k £2.01k £918 £160
Total expenditure £431 £234 £1.04k £1.92k £685
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 22 March 2025 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 22 March 2025 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 06 August 2024 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 06 August 2024 183 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 09 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 Willowbath Lane
Wirksworth
Matlock
Matlock
Derbyshi
Phone:
01629826397