Financial history WOLVERHAMPTON UNIT 374 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 509874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.93k £41.99k £8.29k £11.07k £14.91k
Total expenditure £5.02k £33.04k £8.84k £13.92k £20.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £38.24k N/A N/A £6.68k