Financial history THE NEWBRIDGE PROJECT

Charity number: 1173849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £257.28k £345.88k £472.35k £364.44k £625.00k
Total expenditure £242.32k £253.33k £369.67k £428.03k £537.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £34.98k £38.00k £87.35k £166.28k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £508
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £206.86k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £417.63k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £536.43k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.34k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0