Trustees ASHFIELD RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1176244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DESMOND WOOD Chair 01 June 2017
None on record
Brian Dobb Trustee 30 July 2024
None on record
Leanne Reeves Trustee 02 June 2024
None on record
Mathew Turnbull Trustee 02 June 2024
None on record
THOMAS GREASLEY Trustee 25 July 2023
None on record
THOMAS MARK CHILDS Trustee 25 July 2023
None on record
LOIS RILEY Trustee 25 July 2023
None on record
AMANDA TAYLOR Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
NEIL MARTYN CUTTS Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
MARK ANDREW REES Trustee 01 June 2017
FLAMSTEED MARK LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity reporting is overdue by 824 days