THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, PENNINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious and charitable activities in and around the Parish of Pennington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,413 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 28 July 2017: Standard registration
- ST MARK'S PCC, PENNINGTON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael Edwin Burson-Thomas | Chair | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MRS EVE JOLLY | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Anne Nivison | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Elizabeth Haller Bolhoven | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy May Davies | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca-Jane Rickaby | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Young | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ann Scott | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ann Saunders | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Lesley Lloyd | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.65k | £71.52k | £76.74k | £70.25k | £75.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.86k | £72.99k | £64.96k | £75.16k | £85.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.66k | £8.14k | £8.32k | £10.50k | £1.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Ramley Road
Lymington
SO41 8HF
- Phone:
- 01590672896
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window