JESMOND DENE REAL TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation by the provision of facilities for playing Real Tennis.public (2) To conserve, preserve and improve for the public benefit as buildings of historic interest the Real Tennis Court and house at Matthew Bank, Newcastle upon Tyne NE2 3RE and to educate the public about the history and heritage of the buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 25 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John LARKIN | Trustee | 23 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Antony Richard SANDERSON | Trustee | 27 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Paul AVERLEY | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Darren James SPURLING | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Professor John Lional TAYLOR | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
RAMY ZACK | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
Michael Howard | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
RICHARD JOHN MACALISTER | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.42k | £60.57k | £116.42k | £65.97k | £67.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.98k | £59.14k | £78.72k | £89.34k | £83.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £33.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING REAL TENNIS. 2) TO CONSERVE, PRESERVE AND IMPROVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS BUILDINGS OF HISTORIC INTEREST THE REAL TENNIS COURT AND HOUSE AT MATTHEW BANK, JESMOND DENE ROAD, NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE NE2 3RE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE BUILDINGS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 HIGHBURY
JESMOND
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 3LN
- Phone:
- 01912816854
- Email:
- club@jdrtc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window