CFD (CENTRE FOR DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING PEOPLE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is of a Bristol where everyone can participate in all aspects of life in the city, whatever their level of hearing. The majority of our staff and trustees are Deaf or hard of hearing themselves and we fully understand the impact of living with hearing loss. We can share experiences and provide practical information and advice on dealing with the challenges hearing loss brings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £227,403 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 09 October 2017: CIO registration
- CFD (Working name)
- CFD CENTRE FOR DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING PEOPLE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhian Elena Greaves | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Richardson | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Piers Kittel | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frank Evason | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Faye Stewart | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALASDAIR JAMES GRANT | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILL BEHENNA | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|||||
CLAIRE PATRICIA WICKHAM | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £321.89k | £111.52k | £142.03k | £170.37k | £292.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.70k | £135.32k | £152.43k | £196.24k | £214.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £91.17k | £107.25k | £113.96k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £91.17k | N/A | £21.25k | £123.57k | £227.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING IN BRISTOL AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CENTRE FOR DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING
THE VASSALL CENTRE
GILL AVENUE
BRISTOL
BS16 2QQ
- Phone:
- 01179398653
- Email:
- office@centrefordeaf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window