Financial history THE 3 PILLARS - FEEDING THE HOMELESS

Charity Number: 1173518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £63.53k £78.08k £96.92k £86.12k £80.17k
Total expenditure £58.03k £59.92k £71.48k £96.56k £91.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.93k