Trustees CROYDON YOUTH ZONE

Charity number: 1173107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Palvesh Patel Trustee 22 April 2025
None on record
Crispin Rees Trustee 22 April 2025
None on record
Jaynisha Amin Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Simon Reginald Culpeper Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
John Edwin Trayfoot Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Inderjit Chatwal Trustee 17 April 2023
None on record
Shelley Davies Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record