THE PLAYWORK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides Advocacy, advice and information; Sponsors Or Undertakes Research; Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body for Playworkers and Playwork
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH JANE BERRY | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Penelope Mary Dunn Wilson | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Stephenson | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Mackin | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Stobart | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN BAZLEY | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WOOD | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Simon Rix | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Julia Green | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sion Lewis Edwards | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40 | £40 | £5.03k | £121 | £68 | |
|
Total expenditure | £120 | £120 | £1.59k | £1.09k | £915 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £4.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN CHILDREN’S PLAY AND PLAYWORK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (I) PROVIDING INFORMATION, (II) RAISING AWARENESS, (III) FACILITATING DISCOURSE (IV) CARRYING OUT RESEARCH AND (V) BUILDING CAPACITY. NOTES FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘CHILDREN’S PLAY’ MEANS THE FREELY CHOSEN PROCESS, PERSONALLY DIRECTED AND INTRINSICALLY MOTIVATED BY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. THAT IS, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE DETERMINE AND CONTROL THE CONTENT AND INTENT OF THEIR PLAY, BY FOLLOWING THEIR OWN INSTINCTS, IDEAS AND INTERESTS, IN THEIR OWN WAY FOR THEIR OWN REASONS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘PLAYWORK’ MEANS THE PROFESSION OR VOCATION DEDICATED TO THE PLAYWORK PRINCIPLES, AS DEFINED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE PLAYWORK PRINCIPLES SCRUTINY GROUP, OR WHICHEVER RECOGNISED BODY MAY SUCCEED IT IN SUCH ROLE (SEE APPENDIX 2 FOR THE CURRENT PLAYWORK PRINCIPLES).
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Cobden Road
Wrexham
LL13 7TH
- Phone:
- 07508 822309
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window