Financial history CASA MEA UK

Charity number: 1175421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £51.38k £45.58k £142.50k £62.00k £88.34k
Total expenditure £88.80k £44.60k £84.78k £101.60k £111.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A