Financial history UNIVERSITY OF YORK MUSIC PRESS

Charity number: 1179137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £55.53k £50.77k £32.30k £57.89k £24.06k
Total expenditure £27.97k £26.93k £30.04k £26.26k £24.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.32k N/A £1.48k N/A