Financial history THE CROSSINGS

Charity number: 1175115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.34k £15.40k £14.14k £33.02k £16.76k
Total expenditure £9.50k £9.27k £19.31k £18.69k £17.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £8.00k £5.00k