Financial history THE NORWEGIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1176607
Charity reporting is up to date (126 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £799.27k £983.21k £576.10k £1.94m £766.06k
Total expenditure £881.20k £605.19k £464.76k £583.66k £871.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.15k N/A N/A £194
Income - Donations and legacies £428.16k £867.50k £509.29k £424.42k £580.77k
Income - Other trading activities £122.07k £11.75k £6.65k £25.82k £68.92k
Income - Charitable activities £176.40k £38.02k £6.31k £41.15k £75.06k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £71.95k £65.94k £53.84k £179.36k £41.31k
Income - Other £700 £0 £0 £1.27m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £93.12k £50.46k £3.34k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £717.00k £567.91k £448.74k £526.58k £765.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds £164.20k £37.28k £16.02k £57.08k £105.59k
Expenditure - Governance £13.18k £14.12k £18.00k £14.90k £9.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0