Financial history STOGURSEY AND DISTRICT VICTORY HALL COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1173753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £200.12k £252.71k £77.27k £53.81k £63.13k
Total expenditure £193.90k £230.00k £79.88k £48.50k £73.42k
Income from government contracts N/A £140 N/A £300 N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k £177.00k £5.66k £4.00k £400