STOGURSEY AND DISTRICT VICTORY HALL COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust is responsible for providing and operating a village hall and playing field for the benefit of the people of Stogursey and the local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 July 2017: CIO registration
- 15 October 2017: Funds received from 304637 STOGURSEY AND DISTRICT VICTORY HALL COMMITTEE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Ranson | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sue Hocking | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Joanna Grace Cavill | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
John Nicholson | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Plowright | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Lisa Ann Dunwood | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Allan Henry Searle | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||||
JOHN BAKER | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
RON DYER | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.12k | £252.71k | £77.27k | £53.81k | £63.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.90k | £230.00k | £79.88k | £48.50k | £73.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £140 | N/A | £300 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £177.00k | £5.66k | £4.00k | £400 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF STOGURSEY IN SOMERSET AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGEDISABILOITRY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Tower Hill
Stogursey
BRIDGWATER
Somerset
TA5 1PR
- Phone:
- 0127 872181
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window