Financial history FRIENDS OF LINCOLN HOSPITALS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £17.45k £1.12k £4.73k £32.09k £357.95k
Total expenditure £11.41k £4.12k £11.15k £19.00k £39.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A