EMMANUEL CHURCH WSM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide church services to encourage people in their Christian faith and to support each other. Visiting to keep people in touch and valued. Weekly lunch to provide love and care to the disadvantaged. Deaf Church meets monthly, and Thursday Friendship group meet weekly in term time. NA, CA & AA meet on six evenings and some day time meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Somerset
Governance
- 28 March 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Thomas George Edward Webber | Chair | 28 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Sandra Jean Beckford | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Lisa Pilgrim | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hanson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
June Morgan | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sheila Barbara Judson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Martyn Bury | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Larissa Margaret Tebboth Trust | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Sheila Mary Passey | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Hill | Trustee | 31 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
DINA PATRICIA DRAKE PARKER | Trustee | 16 March 2005 |
|
|||||
Margaret Hill | Trustee | 10 July 1988 |
|
|
||||
CARL EVANS | Trustee | 17 April 1986 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.86k | £28.90k | £23.17k | £54.20k | £81.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.24k | £47.14k | £34.31k | £35.15k | £54.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.07k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 1956
Charitable objects
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCILS (POWERS) MEASURE 1956 AS AMENDED, AND THE CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES (CONTAINED IN SCHEDULE 3 TO THE SYNODICAL GOVERNMENT MEASURE 1969 AS AMENDED).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmanuel Church
Oxford Street
Weston-super-Mare
BS23 1TN
- Phone:
- 01934641016
- Email:
- office@ccwsm.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window