Financial history THE KING EDWARD VI COLLEGE SITE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1174184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £115.91k £98.88k £93.20k £148.00k £191.31k
Total expenditure £116.14k £85.08k £111.06k £155.09k £181.02k
Income from government contracts £15.18k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k N/A N/A N/A