Trustees CORNWALL'S REGIMENTAL MUSEUM

Charity number: 1174375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Champness Chair 24 June 2020
None on record
James Douglas Robinson Trustee 22 May 2025
None on record
Jack Scard Morgan Trustee 22 May 2025
ST JOSEPH'S SCHOOL, LAUNCESTON
Received: On time
Andrew Harbert Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Harriet Hills Trustee 25 March 2022
None on record
DANIEL BRINSON Trustee 25 March 2022
BODMIN LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
LT COL RICHARD BROOKING TRANT Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record
SARAH MARGARET MARY FITZGERALD Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record
COLONEL SIR EDWARD THOMAS BOLITHO KCVO OBE Trustee 04 April 2015
THE SAILORS' INSTITUTE
Received: On time
THE BOLITHO MADRON CHARITY
Received: On time