Financial history ST MARY'S STUDENTS' UNION

Charity Number: 1173502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £629.01k £433.53k £512.59k £486.32k £491.92k
Total expenditure £574.93k £380.59k £509.06k £546.46k £560.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £416.00k N/A £400.42k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £62.18k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £161.68k N/A £49.99k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £129 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £51.21k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £564.32k N/A £427.75k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £10.61k N/A £81.31k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A