Accounts and annual returns FOLKESTONE COMMUNITY SWING BAND

Charity number: 1175587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 July 2024 174 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 September 2024 1332 days late Download Open in new window