Financial history FOLKESTONE COMMUNITY SWING BAND

Charity number: 1175587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.04k £390 £370 £1.20k £3.02k
Total expenditure £1.09k £241 £326 £1.06k £2.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A