CHATTERBUS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CIO administers the C1, C2 and C3 bus services in the Cobham area and looks to provide concessionary travel to those who need it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £14,840 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR GERALD ACHER CBE LVO | Chair | 24 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Leonard John Hobhouse Beighton | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN LEWIS | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Jane Halliwell | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margery Briscoe | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lady Joyce Kathleen Acher | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Charles Taylor | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN STEWART NELSON FCA | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Burley | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID COLIN BELLCHAMBER LLB | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY GRAVES | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.02k | £96.21k | £109.08k | £161.89k | £176.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.00k | £80.92k | £134.53k | £161.66k | £177.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £42.69k | £40.98k | £35.50k | £0 | £14.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FACILITIES IN NORTH SURREY AND SURROUNDING AREA FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE THEY ARE ELDERLY, POOR OR DISABLED, PEOPLE WITH YOUNG CHILDREN OR THOSE LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS WHERE THERE ARE NO ADEQUATE PUBLIC TRANSPORT FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Klidon House
Leigh Place
COBHAM
Surrey
KT11 2HL
- Phone:
- 01932866770
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
chatterbus.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window