Financial history WOOLSERY & DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SHOW

Charity number: 1175580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £37.60k £36.31k £38.06k
Total expenditure £1.15k £3.40k £35.88k £30.68k £29.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.00k N/A N/A