ADVENTIST RADIO LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Adventist Radio London is a religious broadcaster sharing the proclamation and teachings of the Gospel of Jesus Christ throughout the London and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 November 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirk Matthew Thomas | Chair | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nathan John Stickland | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Swaby | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Dwayne Lawson | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £455.71k | £611.88k | £922.05k | £337.43k | £331.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £409.95k | £681.12k | £845.59k | £298.15k | £349.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £611.88k | £922.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £681.12k | £845.59k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £9.53k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 December 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 December 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 23 September 2020 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 23 September 2020 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÆS OBJECT IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROCLAMATION AND TEACHINGS OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY MEANS OF RADIO AND TELEVISION BROADCASTING, VIA THE INTERNET, THE EXHIBITION OF FILMS, THROUGH THE PRINTED WORD AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE IN HARMONY WITH THE PURPOSE AND POLICY OF THE BRITISH UNION CONFERENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH OF ENGLAND CONFERENCE
25 ST. JOHNS ROAD
WATFORD
WD17 1PZ
- Phone:
- 01923232728
- Email:
- arl@secadventist.org.uk
- Website:
-
adventistradio.london
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window