Financial history SAMARITANS OF BARNSLEY

Charity number: 1173665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.31k £46.81k £16.97k £28.36k £21.48k
Total expenditure £25.76k £28.93k £30.54k £18.49k £26.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.60k £23.40k £7.80k £13.90k £15.60k