Trustees SAMARITANS OF BARNSLEY

Charity number: 1173665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen O'Hanlon Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
NORMA HORSLEY-BROWN Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
BRENDA WADE Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Tina Fishburn Trustee 13 September 2023
None on record
Robert Symons Trustee 28 July 2021
None on record
Zubair Saeed Trustee 28 July 2021
None on record
Stephanie Palmer Trustee 05 May 2012
None on record