Global Anaesthesia Development Partnerships

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with partners in low- and middle-income countries to support the development of anesthesia. Activities include teaching, leadership development, mentorship and quality improvement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 November 2017: CIO registration
- GLOBAL ANAESTHESIA DEVELOPMENT PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR DYLAN BOULD | Chair | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Atakiltie Baraki | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manisha Patel | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Evelyn Marshall | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Robert Gray | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Notulu Mwenda | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nathan Oates | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jayne Sutherland | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Crichton | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abel Mwale | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hazel Mumphansha | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Naomi Shamambo | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR EMMA LILLIE | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Major EMMA COLEY MBCHB | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.15k | £86.51k | £91.29k | £21.12k | £49.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.32k | £30.13k | £109.61k | £44.44k | £45.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.96k | £2.89k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Nov 2017 as amended on 13 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING OF LIVES FOR PEOPLE UNDERGOING SURGERY IN UNDERDEVELOPED COUNTRIES BY TRAINING PROVIDERS IN ANAESTHESIA PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 2774
182-184 High Street North
LONDON
E6 2JA
- Phone:
- 01250875821
- Email:
- info@gadpartnerships.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window