BEXHILL-ON-SEA LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bexhill-on-Sea Lions Club is part of Lions Clubs International. Their purpose is to serve local communities and the principles to which clubs must adhere include acting to benefit the public interest. All monies raised by fundraising are spent supporting good causes (often registered charities, but also including charitable grants to individuals and organisations).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 31 August 2017: CIO registration
- 27 January 2020: Funds received from 1065756 BEXHILL-ON-SEA LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
- BEXHILL LIONS CLUB (Working name)
- Bexhill-on-Sea Lions Club (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Pratt | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Hicken | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
June Hough | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Saunders | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Ridout | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Mary Edwards | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
George William Coleman | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Ralph Burstow | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
GORDON RICKSON HOUGH | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.44k | £13.79k | £39.19k | £31.85k | £29.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.55k | £9.14k | £33.09k | £24.64k | £39.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND & WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP BY: PROMOTING THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; ENCOURAGING MEMBERS TO TAKE AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE CIVIC, CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY; PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE OPEN DISCUSSION OF ALL MATTERS OF PUBLIC INTEREST; PROVIDED THAT PARTISAN POLITICS AND SECTARIAN RELIGION SHALL NOT BE DEBATED BY MEMBERS; ENCOURAGING SERVICE-MINDED PEOPLE TO SERVE THEIR COMMUNITY WITHOUT PERSONAL REWARD AND ENCOURAGING THE PROMOTION OF HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN COMMERCE, INDUSTRY, PROFESSIONS, PUBLIC WORKS AND PRIVATE ENDEAVOURS; SUPPORTING YOUTH TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE IN LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES; PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF; THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PREVENTING AVOIDABLE BLINDNESS, ASSISTING DISABLED PEOPLE TO LEAD INDEPENDENT LIVES OR HELPING TO PREVENT OR MANAGE HEALTH ISSUES; PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND/OR PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 St. Leonards Road
Bexhill-on-Sea
East Sussex
TN40 1JB
- Phone:
- 0345 833 9591
- Email:
- rickhough@me.com
- Website:
-
bexhill-lions.org.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window