House of Caring, Sierra Leone

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
House of Caring Sierra Leone, looks after approximately twelve orphaned boys in a residential home in Sierra Leone. We also support three orphaned girls who live with relatives. The members, through fundraising activities and donation, provide the education and daily living requirements of the boys and girls. Rent, maintenance of the home and salaries have to be met also. We wish to expand.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Sierra Leone
- United States
Governance
- 12 February 2018: CIO registration
- MUSAC HOUSE OF CARING (UK) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADE DARAMY | Chair | 03 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Joy Richards | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIS ADEKUMBI OLUKOTUN-WILLIAMS | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MADONNA AUDREY JOHNSON | Trustee | 15 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAFIA AMY GABBIDON | Trustee | 23 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOY FRASER-AMOSUN | Trustee | 22 June 2010 |
|
|||||
FRANCESS HANNAH EASMON | Trustee | 22 June 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.53k | £3.43k | £5.06k | £5.38k | £3.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.36k | £7.17k | £3.14k | £2.26k | £4.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Feb 2018 as amended on 10 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP AMONGST ORPHANS AND SUCH OTHER VULNERABLE CHILDREN IN SIERRA LEONE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT INCLUDING EDUCATION AND SHELTER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 HOLLYCROFT CLOSE
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 7FE
- Phone:
- 07578504787
- Email:
- houseofcaringsluk@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window