WALSALL WOOD (FORMER ALLOTMENT) CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make grants to disadvantaged individuals residents in the borough of Walsall in particular for household and electrical items, school uniform and clothing; the charity cannot use any part of its income to make cash payments directly to individuals in relief of taxes, public funds or items such as rent arrears and utility bills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Walsall
Governance
- 13 October 1980: Standard registration
- WALSALL WOOD ALLOTMENT CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNCILLOR KEITH SEARS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Councillor Amanda Parkes | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Vera Waters | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Councillor Ken Ferguson | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
MR ALAN PAUL | Trustee |
|
||||||
COUNCILLOR MIKE BIRD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.01k | £27.55k | £28.09k | £28.84k | £29.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.04k | £0 | £4.45k | £21.04k | £6.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 1993, AS AMENDED 23 JANUARY 2006. as amended on 02 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
(1) RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF THE BENEFICIARIES. (2) THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY THE WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
FORMER TOWNSHIP OF WALSALL WOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COUNCIL HOUSE
LICHFIELD STREET
WALSALL
WS1 1TW
- Phone:
- 01922653204
- Email:
- charities@walsall.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window