BRADFORD SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1173985
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To enable persons in Bradford and the surrounding area as well as elsewhere who are experiencing feelings of distress or despair, including those who may be at risk of suicide, to receive confidential emotional support at any time of the day or night in order to improve their emotional health and to reduce the incidence of suicide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £10,812
Total expenditure: £28,930

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 October 1964: Standard registration
  • 09 December 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £43.08k £44.73k £20.89k £10.81k
Total expenditure £47.30k £61.18k £26.57k £28.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 October 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 June 2019 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 June 2019 140 days late

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/07/1978 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/1986 AS AMENDED ON 29/01/1987 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/1991 AS AMENDED ON 10/08/2006 AS AMENDED ON 07/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2014 AS AMENDED ON 03/12/2015 AS AMENDED ON 29 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
1)TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN BRADFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECIEVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND FRIENDSHIP FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO,WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITANPROCEDURE,REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVINGSPECIALISED OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS. 2) TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF THE SAMARITANS
Area of benefit
BRADFORD AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Registration history
  • 21 October 1964 : Standard registration
  • 09 December 2021 : Removed