Financial history VECTIS ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST

Charity number: 1174499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.51k £5.00k £6.56k £8.14k £4.22k
Total expenditure £2.72k £1.68k £9.31k £11.43k £6.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A