Financial history DIGNITY ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1178186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £106.25k £263.50k £1.52m £1.19m £4.31m
Total expenditure £113.69k £279.68k £898.65k £1.84m £2.21m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £1.52m £1.19m £4.31m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £898.65k £1.84m £2.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £7.11k £7.78k £16.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £890.22k £1.79m £2.11m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0