Financial history CHRISTIAN EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 510721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £617 £530 £308 £13.93k £2.19k
Total expenditure £9.58k £15.20k £10.05k £12.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A