COM CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND HELP RELIEVE HARDSHIP FOR ALL PEOPLE IN ALL ITS FORMS, WHEREVER IT OCCURS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
115 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 15 February 2019: Standard registration
- 08 April 2022: Funds received from 1071744 DUNSTABLE COMMUNITY CHURCH TRUST
- COM CHURCH DUNSTABLE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN DOUGLAS RICHARDS | Chair | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EDWARD OWEN | Trustee | 24 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHARON CLAUDIA FAY SIMMS | Trustee | 24 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Damani Johnson | Trustee | 24 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE MCCALLA | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE ROLAND COOK | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY JOHN PRESTON | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £381.53k | £293.03k | £329.84k | £374.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.19k | £338.72k | £406.66k | £396.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.36k | £2.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 FEB 2018 as amended on 24 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN DUNSTABLE AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE COMPANY 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY IN DUNSTABLE BY: -THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS AND SERVICES -THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 HIGH STREET NORTH
DUNSTABLE
LU6 1JF
- Phone:
- 01582477147
- Email:
- info@comchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window