Trustees 2FACED DANCE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1178796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amy Leanne Dalton-Hardy Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Georgia Farrell Shire Trustee 15 January 2024
None on record
Jason Reece Boyle Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
ELAINE KNIGHT Trustee 21 March 2018
None on record
ALEXANDER MAYNARD GREEN Trustee 14 September 2015
None on record