SUSTAINABLE CHARLBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running projects that have a positive impact on the planet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 02 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY JAMES CRISP | Chair | 28 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Ruth Weston | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Carmody | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Daniel Epps | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sean Alan Hosking | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Hugh Thomas Goyder | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Mark Foss Langton Gregory | Trustee | 03 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH FRANCES REASON | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.56k | £30.00k | £30.00k | £41.15k | £30.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.60k | £5.47k | £5.47k | £17.93k | £42.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £200 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF SUSTAINABLE CHARLBURY ARE TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN 25 MILES OF CHARLBURY OX7 3EW, BY PROMOTING THE DEPLOYMENT OF SUSTAINABLE ENERGY, PROMOTING EDUCATION IN CLIMATE CHANGE, REDUCING ENERGY DEMAND AND CARBON EMISSIONS AND MAKING GRANTS TO SUCH ORGANISATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL SEE FIT IN ORDER TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE DEVELOPMENT OF A SUSTAINABLE ENERGY SYSTEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sharenergy
The Pump House
Coton Hill
SHREWSBURY
SY1 2DP
- Phone:
- 01608810716
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window