STONEHILL COMMUNITY GARDENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We welcome people from all walks of life working on half an acre, producing fruit, vegetables, eggs from our hens and honey from our bees. Our aim is to bring people closer to nature and to share the joys of being outside and gardening together. We hope it will be a place that will be beneficial to all people including those from disadvantaged and/or vulnerable backgrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Anne Curthoys | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CLARKE FCCA | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|||||
DARLA ENO | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL SCHARF | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.21k | £18.73k | £4.52k | £9.23k | £3.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.04k | £10.71k | £9.14k | £5.67k | £7.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION BY PROVIDING AN AREA FOR USE AS A COMMUNITY GARDEN AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS IN ABINGDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ABINGDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING ABOUT HORTICULTURE, ANIMAL HUSBANDRY AND ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION, SUSTAINABILITY AND CONSERVATION IN AND AROUND THE COMMUNITY GARDEN.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DRIFTWAY
SUTTON WICK LANE
DRAYTON
ABINGDON
OX14 4HJ
- Phone:
- 07887982393
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window