Financial history WEST SMETHWICK ENTERPRISE

Charity Number: 1176750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £505.53k £565.72k £705.84k £750.21k £759.23k
Total expenditure £452.08k £500.58k £634.68k £735.55k £796.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.36k £85.43k £41.27k £90.69k £84.42k
Income - Donations and legacies £227.74k £202.95k £318.09k £283.38k £203.12k
Income - Other trading activities £439 £0 £99 £293 £0
Income - Charitable activities £277.04k £362.24k £0 £466.54k £556.11k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £311 £539 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £387.64k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £452.08k £500.58k £634.68k £735.55k £796.38k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £8.00k £8.24k £8.90k £8.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0