Financial history THE FRIENDS OF DURHAM WOODLAND CEMETERY

Charity number: 1176990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.76k £10.55k £481 £1.18k £400
Total expenditure £523 £390 £442 £2.02k £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £840 N/A