WESTCLIFF JEWISH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are the support of Orthodox Jewish religion, education and welfare generally, by making grants to charitable organisations.In setting objectives and planning for activities, the trustees have given due consideration to general guidance published by the charity commission relating to public benefit, and in particular to its supplementary public benefit guidance o
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Haim Yossef Deutsch | Trustee | 17 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ARON ENGEL | Trustee | 17 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHLOMO FINK | Trustee | 17 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.89k | £283.00k | £4.29k | £132.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.72k | £286.80k | £30.44k | £109.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 688 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 688 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 April 2025 | 1013 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 April 2025 | 1013 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 264 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO SYNAGOGUES AND OTHER RELIGIOUS CHARITIES FOR THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS OBJECTS, PRAYER BOOKS AND OTHER RELIGIOUS STUDY BOOKS, AND FOR THE PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ORTHODOX JEWISH EDUCATION AND EDUCATION IN GENERAL BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND INFIRMITY BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES WORKING TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND INFIRMITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Britannia Gardens
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
SS0 8BN
- Phone:
- 01702431053
- Email:
- mv@mailvg.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window