Financial history TCL RE USE

Charity number: 1177557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £340.44k £334.99k £416.48k £435.75k £423.23k
Total expenditure £322.85k £330.32k £312.61k £446.38k £404.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £132.75k £16.23k £3.45k N/A