Financial history BIRMINGHAM HIPPODROME THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 510842
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.41m £7.08m £13.18m £28.99m £36.98m
Total expenditure £28.28m £7.37m £14.37m £27.56m £38.07m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £73.00k
Income from government grants £98.00k £3.83m £647.00k £2.00m £100.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £750.00k £623.00k £904.00k £857.00k £725.00k
Income - Other trading activities £3.26m £117.00k £1.44m £2.62m £3.48m
Income - Charitable activities £22.31m £6.29m £10.79m £25.38m £32.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £94.00k £47.00k £50.00k £131.00k £613.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £25.64m £7.08m £13.23m £25.91m £35.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.64m £285.00k £1.13m £1.65m £2.22m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £56.00k £105.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0