Financial history ATOM FESTIVAL OF SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 1176186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.34k £2.17k £8.11k £12.53k £9.46k
Total expenditure £10.74k £2.70k £5.17k £16.59k £6.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £600 £1.20k £800 £1.00k